Moon, Jenni (CPSO#: 62553)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Ginsberg, Jennifer Marjory (used until: 10 Jul 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012