Moore, Aideen Marie Antoinette (CPSO#: 53149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5295
Fax: (416) 813-5245
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-5295
Fax: (416) 813-5245
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-5295
Fax: (416) 813-5245
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIDEEN MARIE ANTOINETTE MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1986