Moore, Ainsley Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moore ( CPSO# 70272 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Woman's Clinic
101 Queensway West
Suite 401
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 629-4516

Business Address:
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 973-0515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AINSLEY ELIZABETH MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010