Moore, Albert Rae (CPSO#: 85961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1001 decarie
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 34880

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT RAE MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007