Moore, Andrea Margaret Lillian (CPSO#: 68989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Brock 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3359
Fax: (613) 544-3559
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moore ( CPSO# 68989 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Brock 3
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MARGARET LILLIAN MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999