Moore, April Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yarmouth Regional Hospital
60 Vancouver Street
Yarmouth, Nova Scotia
Yarmouth NS  B5A 2P5
Phone: (902) 742-3541
Fax: (902) 742-0369

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. APRIL ELIZABETH MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 12 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 13 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 04 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2001