Moore, Dana Lynn (CPSO#: 72219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 439-0346
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA LYNN MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2001