Moore, Douglas Roland (CPSO#: 25306)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2006