Moore, Heidi Joyce Elizabeth (CPSO#: 100221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Court Medical Clinic
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 1Z9
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Fax: (613) 739-7043
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Moore ( CPSO# 100221)

Business Address:
Riverside Court Medical Clinic
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 1Z9
Phone Number: (613) 739-3700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEIDI JOYCE ELIZABETH MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016