Moore Hepburn, Charlotte (CPSO#: 83304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: Moore, Charlotte (used until: 14 Jan 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Medicine
Black 10
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: (416) 813-5663
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE MOORE HEPBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE HEPBURN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2006