Moore, Jennifer Dorothy (CPSO#: 92551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Loyola University of Chicago, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Palliative Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7255
Fax: (416) 480-5146
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Jennifer  Dorothy  Moore may practise medicine independently in Palliative
            Care, only.