Moore, Katherine (CPSO#: 83719)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2005 to 14 Oct 2005
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010