Moore, Kieran Michael (CPSO#: 55407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2074 Balantrae Circle
Kingston ON  K7M 9H7
Phone: (613) 453-0391
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KFLA Public Health
221 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 1V5
Canada
Phone: 613 549 1232 Ext. 1121
Fax: 613 549 1209
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kieran M. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moore ( CPSO# 55407 )

Business Address:
2074 Balantrae Circle
Kingston ON  K7M 9H7
Phone Number: (613) 453-0391

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 09 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIERAN MICHAEL MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 10 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 09 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 08 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1986