Moore, Kimberly Anne (CPSO#: 79880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3742 Nafziger Road
Wellesley ON  N0B 2T0
Phone: (519) 656-2220
Fax: (519) 656-3173
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10B Victoria St. S
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
Phone: 519-783-0020
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Suite 4111
Laurelwood Dr.
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2
Canada
Phone: 519-904-0658
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANNE MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005