Moore, Leonard John (CPSO#: 70345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
First Floor
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Phone: (613) 569-3488 Ext. 2114
Fax: (613) 569-3484
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
Health Services
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Canada
Phone: (613) 789-8458
Fax: (613) 789-8710
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD JOHN MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998