Moore, Lori Ann (CPSO#: 53977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
Suite DI
1450 Highway #2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-4933
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Moore ( CPSO# 53977 )

Business Address:
Courtice Health Centre
Suite DI
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI ANN MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1987