Moore, Malcolm Joseph (CPSO#: 51236)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Princess Margaret Hospital 610 University Avenue Toronto, ON M9A 3J3
Date Received: 04 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2015