Moore, Nicholas Jasper (CPSO#: 20756)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 302 20 Wynford Drive Toronto ON M3C 1J4
Date Received: 23 May 2017


Address: (416) 445-9673
Instructions: Please contact the above phone number for medical record inquiries. Records have transferred into the possession of the physician who has taken over the practice.
Date Received: 29 Jun 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2017