Moore, Peter Cameron Forrester (CPSO#: 17570)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jul 2003
Summary:

 On July 24, 2003, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Moore(s plea and found that he committed 
 acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with patients.  The 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Moore be reprimanded and that within 7 days of the order.

Dr. Moore 
 executed an undertaking dated July 24, 2003, as follows:

I, Peter Cameron Forrester Moore, hereby 
 resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.

I promise not to apply for 
 registration or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

I consent to the terms of 
 this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.

I 
 have obtained legal advice before giving this undertaking.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 24, 2003


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 1998
Summary:

 In July 1998, Dr. Moore pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct in that he has 
 committed sexual impropiety with a patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Moore(s plea, 
 by way of Agreed Statement of Facts and Consent Disposition, and found him guilty of professional 
 misconduct.  

The Discipline Committee accepted the Statement of Agreed Facts and Consent 
 Disposition and ordered the following penalty:

Dr. Moore to appear before this Committee to be 
 reprimanded and directs that the fact of the reprimand be recorded in the register.

That the 
 imposition of any further penalty is suspended upon the following terms:

(1)	Dr. Moore will 
 continue in psychotherapy with a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar.

(2)	Dr. Moore will 
 instruct his treating psychiatrist, and Dr. Moore(s treating psychiatrist will indicate his or her 
 agreement in writing to the College, to notify the Registrar of the College in the event that he 
 or she identifies any change in Dr. Moore(s condition which gives him or her cause for concern 
 that Dr. Moore(s patients might be at risk.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 06, 1998


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Feb 1991
Summary:

 In February 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Moore guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Moore be reprimanded, 
 with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also ordered that 
 Dr. Moore(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of two years.  The suspension itself 
 would be suspended at the end of two months, provided that Dr. Moore(s therapist or a supervisor 
 acceptable to the Registrar provided quarterly reports, satisfactory to the Registrar.  These 
 reports were to be provided on an ongoing basis, until the psychotherapy and the supervision were 
 concluded to the satisfaction of the Registrar.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 21 Feb 1991

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: August 14, 2003
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from July 24, 2003, Dr. Peter Cameron Forrester Moore undertakes to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario not to apply for registration as a physician or for a
licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.