Moore, Randy Duane (CPSO#: 68545)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998