Moore, Simon Gordon Douglas (CPSO#: 99925)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Highland Health Clinic 140 Rolling Hills Drive Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 29 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015