Moore, Stephen Blair (CPSO#: 23044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp.
60 Conelia St W
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: 613-485-7111
Fax: 613-273-2665
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: 613-485-7111
Fax: 613-273-2665
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Blair Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moore ( CPSO# 23044 )

Business Address:
Perth & Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 485-7111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN BLAIR MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001