Moore, Terrence Leo (CPSO#: 26195)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Michael's Hospital Medical Records Department 30 Bond St Toronto, ON M5B 1W8 Tel: 416-360-4000
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018