Moore, Wieslawa Hanna (CPSO#: 64901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
4610 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 850-6050
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Weston Road Medical Center
2549 Weston Rd.
Toronto ON  M9N 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 240-8282
Fax: (416) 240-8870
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WIESLAWA HANNA MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Apr 2013
Summary:

On April 12, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wieslawa Hanna Moore committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Moore met Mr. X in the spring of 2002, while Mr. X was completing a renovation contract at 
the clinic where she worked. Dr. Moore hired Mr. X to do renovations on her home in the 
summer of 2002. In 2002, Dr. Moore and Mr. X began a romantic and sexual relationship. 
Shortly thereafter, Mr. X moved into Dr. Moore's home with Dr. Moore and her daughter. 
 
Between approximately 2002 and 2004, Dr. Moore provided isolated and incidental medical 
services to Mr. X, including sending Mr. X for testing and administering immunization shots. 
She did not inform Mr. X's family doctor about all of the care she provided. Dr. Moore did not 
bill OHIP for these services or maintain a patient chart. Dr. Moore states that the romantic 
relationship ended in or around March 2004. Between April 24, 2005 and July 28, 2005, Dr. 
Moore saw Mr. X as a patient at the clinic where she was employed on four occasions. 
       
Between April 24, 2005 and December 29, 2005, Dr. Moore provided medical services to her 
daughter, Ms Y at the clinic where she worked. She also referred Ms Y to other physicians for 
follow up treatment and care. Dr. Moore billed OHIP for her services.  
 
By providing medical treatment to Ms Y and Mr. X, Dr. Moore failed to recognize and maintain 
appropriate boundaries, and caused potential confusion as to whether she was acting in a 
professional or personal role in providing medical treatment. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
      Dr. Moore appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
      the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of 
      registration of Dr. Moore: 
      (i)   Dr.  Moore must successfully complete, at her own expense, the College's 
            Understanding Boundaries in Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient 
            Relationship course, within 12 months of the date of this Order.  
      Dr. Moore pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date 
      of this Order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 12, 2013