Moorehead, Paul Christopher (CPSO#: 84144)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2005 to 05 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013