Moores, Andrew Roderick (CPSO#: 98126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline St. North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: 647-836-6094
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613-732-2811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Moores Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moores ( CPSO# 98126 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW RODERICK MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 17 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015