Moosai-Maharaj, Sastri Gerard (CPSO#: 26862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1654 Bayshire Drive
Oakville ON  L6H 4X7
Phone: (647) 444-9835
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 278-7077
Fax: (905) 275-1582
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

9780 Bramalea Road North
Suite 100
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1
Canada
Phone: (905) 793-5900
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

4288 Village Centre Court
Upper Level
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 275-0058
Fax: (905) 275-1686
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

130 Highway #8
Stoney Creek
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 662-1999
Fax: (905) 662-1480
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

668 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3N6
Canada
Phone: (519) 653-3181
Fax: (519) 653-3777
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

19 Queen Street
Port Hope
Port Hope ON  L1A 2Y8
Canada
Phone: (905) 885-5314
Fax: (905) 885-9160
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

380 Dundas Street East
Unit D15
Oakville ON  L6H 6Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 257-9922
Fax: (905) 257-9101
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

139 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 662-0012
Fax: (905) 662-0505
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

201 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-6300
Fax: (905) 304-4768
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

80 Port Street
Suite H
Mississauga ON  L5G 4V6
Canada
Phone: (905) 278-1649
Fax: (905) 278-6968
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

55 Erb Street East
Suite 203
Waterloo ON  N2J 4K8
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-9199
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

71 King Street West
Suite 301
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Canada
Phone: (905) 279-9971
Fax: (905) 279-3345
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

209 Pinebush Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 7H8
Canada
Phone: (519) 740-3884
Fax: (519) 488-0700
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

1 Promenade Circle
Health Court, Suite 301K
Thornhill ON  L4J 2S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 882-9888
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

75 Napa Valley Ave
Unit 5
Woodbridge ON  L4H 1M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 893-4500
Fax: (905) 893-9130
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

585 Ontario Street South
Unit 208
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-3030
Fax: (905) 636-1414
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Trillium Health Centre-West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

30 Eglinton Ave. West
Suite 750
Mississauga ON  L5R 3E7
Canada
Phone: (289) 232-7279
Fax: (289) 232-7695
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1460 Major Mackenzie Dr West
Suite N3
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H6
Canada
Phone: 905 303 6010
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

5061 New Street
201
Burlington ON  L7L 0G1
Canada
Phone: 905 592 1172
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

230 Silvercreek Pk North
Guelph ON  N1H 7P8
Canada
Phone: 519 767 2886
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

100 Queen Street South
101
Streetsville ON  L5M 1K8
Canada
Phone: 9058218221
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

273 Delrex Blvd.
Georgetown ON  L7G 4G4
Canada
Phone: 905 873 6485
Fax: 905 873 7450
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Moosai-Maharaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moosai-Maharaj ( CPSO# 26862 )

Business Address:
1654 Bayshire Drive
Oakville ON  L6H 4X7
Phone Number: (905) 338-9835

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SASTRI GERARD MOOSAI-MAHARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOSAI-MAHARAJ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1974