Moote, David William (CPSO#: 32263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St.
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8167
Fax: (519) 685-8274
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DW Moote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Moote ( CPSO# 32263 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
B3-110
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8167

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM MOOTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1981