Moote, Douglas John (CPSO#: 52735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jefferson Radiology
85 Seymour Street
Suite 200
Hartford CT  06106
United States
Phone: (860) 246-6589
Fax: (860) 560-2849

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN MOOTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1985