Morales Salame, Eduardo Antonio (CPSO#: 82374)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Juan N. Corpas, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2005 to 23 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2007