Moran, Benvon Mary (CPSO#: 105716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2967
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moran ( CPSO# 105716)

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2967

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Benvon Mary Moran may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Dermatology, Queen's University, in which Dr. Moran
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Moran  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Moran's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Moran's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 1, 2015, and expires on June 30, 2018.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Moran's academic appointment at Queen's University,
                  the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above.