Moran, Bryan Craig (CPSO#: 58042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiac Surgery
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 8 - 8th Floor Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-360-4000 Ext. 6486
Fax: 416-864-6096
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rockman Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rockman ( CPSO# 60865 )
Dr. B. Moran ( CPSO# 58042 )

Business Address:
C2 - 180 Sudbury Street
Toronto ON  M6J 0A8
Phone Number: (647) 524-6216

Business Address:
Suite 306
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 536-5555

Business Address:
Department of Cardiac Surgery
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 8, 8th Floor Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 692-7660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN CRAIG MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988