Moran, Peter Ignatius Mary (CPSO#: 64514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Wasser Pain Managment Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416 586 8700 Ext. 8419
Fax: 416 586 5067
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wasser Pain Management Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
11th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8418
Fax: (416) 586-8654
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Ignatius Mary Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moran ( CPSO# 64514 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
1162 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER IGNATIUS MARY MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1995