Moran, Philip Andrew (CPSO#: 70208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CEPCP
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905)433-4370
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lennox Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moran ( CPSO# 70208 )
Dr. C. Lennox ( CPSO# 70210 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4370

Business Address:
Clarington Urgent Care Clinic
2320 Regional Highway 2
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 697-1466

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Bowmanville Urgent Care Clinic
1100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-6458

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP ANDREW MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001