Moran, Timothy Dennis (CPSO#: 96064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Mental Health Program
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
205A - 2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: 613-729-3316
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SUCD
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
2141 - 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7A4
Canada
Phone: 613-722-6521
Fax: 613-715-5802
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY DENNIS MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016