Morar, Shaheen (CPSO#: 78668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UNIT B6
350 CONESTOGA BLVD
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 622-5100
Fax: (519) 622-2977
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheen Morar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morar ( CPSO# 78668 )

Business Address:
B6 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 622-5100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHEEN MORAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004