Morassut, Patricia Angela (CPSO#: 51238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 404
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 723-5729
Fax: (613) 723-5697
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacLean-Morassut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Morassut ( CPSO# 51238 )
Dr. R. Maclean ( CPSO# 51073 )

Business Address:
404 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 723-6690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANGELA MORASSUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORASSUT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1987