Morava-Protzner, Izabella (CPSO#: 51903)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013