Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Moreau, Guy (CPSO#: 60025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Fax: (613) 746-6008
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hopital Montfort - Chief of Staff
713 Montreal Road Suite 00D118
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 6201
Fax: (613) 748-4939
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Moreau Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moreau ( CPSO# 60025 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
00D119
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988