Moreau, Jan Peter (CPSO#: 61062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 737-2450
Fax: (705) 737-4250
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jan Moreau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moreau ( CPSO# 61062 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 737-2450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN PETER MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1991