Moreau, Veronique (CPSO#: 88441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4289 Inness Road
Ottawa ON  K1E0A8
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Fax: (613) 830-1901
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veronique Moreau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Moreau ( CPSO# 88441 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 686-1911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERONIQUE MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013