Morelli, Moreno (CPSO#: 75466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Montreal, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6530 rue Sherbrooke Ouest
Montreal QC  H4B 1N5
Phone: (514) 848-3317
Fax: (514) 848-3316
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

134-175 Stillview
Pointe Claire QC  H9R 4S3
Canada
Phone: 514-695-7122
Fax: 514-695-2863
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moreno Morelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 22 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORENO MORELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2001