Moreno, Agustin Alexander (CPSO#: 89368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone: (289) 396-2794
Fax: (289) 396-1847
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Tong & A. Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tong ( CPSO# 89317 )
Dr. A. Moreno ( CPSO# 89368 )

Business Address:
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone Number: (289) 396-2794

Business Address:
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
126 - 1984 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGUSTIN ALEXANDER MORENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORENO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011