Moreton, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 57779)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006