Morewood, Gordon Henry (CPSO#: 66856)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002