Morgan, Aida Elgawly (CPSO#: 67885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 333
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 492-6700
Fax: (416) 492-5460
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morgan ( CPSO# 67885 )

Business Address:
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 333
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 492-6700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIDA ELGAWLY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996