Morgan, Anwar Victor Kasry (CPSO#: 56399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
Obstetrical Anesthesia Division
2075 Bayview Avenue, Rm M5-318
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87757
Fax: (416) 480-5614
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pain Management Solutions
Suite 202
6 Maggin Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Canada
Phone: (416) 221-1061
Fax: (416) 221-0585
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

76 Grenville Street
Chronic Pain Management Academic Ce
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6269
Fax: (416) 323-2666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

6 Maginn Mews
Suite 211A
Fibromyalgia Management Centre
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Canada
Phone: (416) 221-1061
Fax: (416) 221-0585
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morgan ( CPSO# 56399 )

Business Address:
6 Maginn Mews
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 221-1061

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M5-318
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6269

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 5, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 2, 2018, Women’s College Hospital (WCH) notified the CPSO, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on February 23, 2018, Dr. Morgan’s privileges at WCH were suspended pending Dr. Morgan’s completion of all his outstanding patient charts at a standard consistent with WCH’s and CPSO’s policies.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANWAR VICTOR KASRY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1989