Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morgan, Bruce Evan (CPSO#: 13437)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1996