Morgan, Daniel Roberts (CPSO#: 106346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 CF Health Services Centre Borden
O-166
PO Box 1000 Station Main
30 route Ortona Rd
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERTS MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017