Morgan, Earl Phillip (CPSO#: 63392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2301 TECUMSEH RD EAST
STE 140
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 915-7097
Fax: 519-915-0417
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Earle Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Morgan ( CPSO# 63392 )

Business Address:
140 - 2301 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 915-7097

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EARL PHILLIP MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)